|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/09/1921 | 08/01/1921 | -251 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1924 | 15/03/1924 | 71 days | General | New cylinders fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5442 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1925 | 06/02/1926 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 599 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1928 | 12/05/1928 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1930 | 03/05/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1932 | 25/06/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1933 | 25/02/1933 | 15 days | General | New cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1934 | 13/10/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1936 | 25/04/1936 | 29 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1937 | 18/12/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1940 | 10/03/1940 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1942 | 01/08/1942 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 11 days | General | New cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1944 | 04/11/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1353 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 442 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
17/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1921. Dep: 08/01/1921. | ||
08/10/1921 | Modification | Diagram 13 number 1548 boiler fitted | ||
27/11/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5442 |
||
10/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
21/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1925. Dep: 06/02/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 599 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/05/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/07/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
22/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930. | ||
28/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13) |
||
11/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1933. Dep: 25/02/1933. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
29/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13) |
||
28/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1936. Dep: 25/04/1936. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
17/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 10/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
10/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1335 but not taken up | ||
14/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1353 |
||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
01/1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61353 but not taken up | ||
24/03/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1353 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |