|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/09/1921 | 22/10/1921 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1923 | 22/12/1923 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 305 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1926 | 14/08/1926 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1928 | 26/05/1928 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1930 | 24/05/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1932 | 28/05/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1934 | 28/07/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1936 | 01/08/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 36 days | General | New cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1940 | 18/01/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1945 | 12/05/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 445 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
22/07/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 22/10/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 305 (Diagram 13) |
||
02/02/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5445 | ||
10/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
20/05/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1926. Dep: 14/08/1926. | ||
07/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
13/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
14/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
19/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930. | ||
23/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13) |
||
11/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
28/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
28/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 12/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1338 but not taken up | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1356 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
14/08/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1356 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |