|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/04/1917 | 02/06/1917 | 43 days | General | New left hand cylinder fitted Boiler number 1215 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1922 | 15/07/1922 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1924 | 16/08/1924 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 1223 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1925 | 12/12/1925 | 113 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1928 | 26/01/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1931 | 11/04/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1933 | 01/07/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1936 | 01/02/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1937 | 30/10/1937 | 36 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1939 | 20/01/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 40 days | Light Repair | Right hand cylinder loose |
||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1942 | 21/11/1942 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1944 | 29/01/1944 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1944 | 26/08/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1947 | 25/08/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1113 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4814 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted |
||
21/04/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1917. Dep: 02/06/1917. Work undertaken: New left hand cylinder fitted Boiler number 1215 (Diagram GC9) |
||
19/08/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1922. Dep: 15/07/1922. | ||
12/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1223 (Diagram GC9) |
||
06/09/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6113 | ||
22/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 26/01/1929. | ||
14/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
10/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
14/07/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
19/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 01/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
31/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
04/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937. | ||
30/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 20/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
13/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
12/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Right hand cylinder loose |
||
31/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
19/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1944. Dep: 29/01/1944. | ||
29/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1350 but not taken up | ||
09/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1477 | ||
25/08/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1477 from Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
25/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/08/1947. Dep: 25/08/1947. |