Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4379 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17785 Week
» 70801 Month
» 190328 Year
» 3217181 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1507 |
m/e |
03/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8507 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7421 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1507 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61507 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A73 |
To Service |
During 03/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 26/02/1953 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1913 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
61C |
|
Keith |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/02/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
08/1941 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1952 |
Keith MPD |
Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1507 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8507 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
08/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7421 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1507 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61507 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
26/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61507 |
|
|
06/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|