Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4117 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17523 Week
» 70539 Month
» 190066 Year
» 3216919 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1535 |
m/e |
03/1915 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8535 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7449 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1535 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
61535 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
M77 |
To Service |
During 03/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 11/12/1959 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
10/1935 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1535 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8535 |
|
|
07/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
05/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
10/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
12/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7449 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1535 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61535 |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61535 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|