Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 611 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18414 Week
» 71430 Month
» 190957 Year
» 3217810 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1542 |
m/e |
07/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8542 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7456 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1542 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61542 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
W82 |
Works Number |
136 |
To Service |
During 07/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/07/1958 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 14 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
02/1935 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1949 |
Stratford Works |
On 20/8 the Repair Shop contained the following: Nos. 1542, 2501/07/90, 64667/91, 65440, 5551, 8317, 8576, 8654, 9633, 69653, 9685. The last M. & G.N. 'J.93' tank-No. 8489-is in Stratford Yard. Stratford still paints 'British Railways' on tanks and tenders which do not carry the crest. |
SLS/194909 |
19/04/1958 |
Cromer MPD |
The allocation at Beach shed is-B12/3, 61514/6/42/7/68 and B1 61312; the latter works usually on the Melton Constable branch and the B12's on Norwich trains. |
SLS/195805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1542 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 136 |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8542 |
|
|
04/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
02/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7456 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1542 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61542 |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
14/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61542 |
|
|