|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 24/11/1923 | 06/02/1924 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1927 | 14/09/1927 | 96 days | General | Boiler number D1963 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1928 | 11/06/1928 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1930 | 17/04/1930 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1932 | 28/12/1932 | 44 days | General | Boiler number HL988 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/07/1935 | 06/09/1935 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 24166 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1937 | 18/11/1937 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 797 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
24/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 06/02/1924. | ||
09/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
11/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 14/09/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1963 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1928. Dep: 11/06/1928. | ||
25/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1930. Dep: 17/04/1930. | ||
15/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1932. Dep: 28/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL988 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1935. Dep: 06/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24166 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
18/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/11/1937. Dep: 18/11/1937. | ||
25/11/1937 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 797 from Selby (SEL) |