|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1917 | 01/1917 | General | Boiler number D146 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1922 | 12/04/1923 | 151 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1926 | 17/09/1926 | 159 days | General | Boiler number D1165 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1927 | 25/02/1928 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1931 | 28/04/1931 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D911 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1933 | 22/12/1933 | 31 days | Special | Tender only |
||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1935 | 18/04/1935 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2658 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1937 | 19/11/1937 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 799 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/01/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number D146 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1922. Dep: 12/04/1923. | ||
12/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1926. Dep: 17/09/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1165 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1927. Dep: 25/02/1928. | ||
09/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1931. Dep: 28/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D911 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 22/11/1933. Dep: 22/12/1933. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
05/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1935. Dep: 18/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2658 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 19/11/1937. Dep: 19/11/1937. | ||
25/11/1937 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 799 from York (North) (YK) |