|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1917 | 04/1917 | General | Boiler number D101 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1920 | 11/1920 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1923 | 25/04/1923 | 98 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1924 | 30/09/1924 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1926 | 28/07/1926 | 120 days | General | Boiler number D845 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1929 | 15/03/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number E4/AW25 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1929 | 05/04/1929 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1932 | 17/05/1932 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2435 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1935 | 26/02/1935 | 54 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1935 | 22/11/1935 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1938 | 29/10/1938 | 69 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1944 | 09/09/1944 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2816 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1912 | Modification | Diagram 50 number D139 boiler fitted | ||
11/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 821 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/04/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number D101 (Diagram 50) |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/11/1920. | ||
07/11/1920 | Modification | Diagram 50 number D1165 boiler fitted | ||
18/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1923. Dep: 25/04/1923. | ||
26/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1924. Dep: 30/09/1924. | ||
31/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1926. Dep: 28/07/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D845 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1929. Dep: 15/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/AW25 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1929. Dep: 05/04/1929. | ||
06/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1932. Dep: 17/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2435 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1935. Dep: 26/02/1935. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
10/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1935. Dep: 22/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938. | ||
14/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
06/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
13/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2816 (Diagram 50) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1323 but not taken up | ||
12/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1697 | ||
12/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. | ||
02/11/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1697 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |