|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 07/00/1922 | 29/11/1922 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 03/02/1926 | 17/06/1926 | 135 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/09/1927 | 09/11/1927 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/07/1929 | 26/09/1929 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1933 | 10/03/1933 | 32 days | General | Boiler number D1206 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1936 | 11/05/1936 | 69 days | General | Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1936 | 18/05/1936 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1937 | 02/03/1937 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1937 | 17/12/1937 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1939 | 02/02/1940 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1941 | 18/11/1941 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1942 | 16/10/1942 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1942 | 23/10/1942 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/09/1946 | 27/09/1946 | 18 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1400 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1949 | 19/02/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3937 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61400 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1953 | 07/02/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24075 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1955 | 29/04/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1957 | 04/06/1957 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1957 | 31/08/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24106 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1957 | 04/09/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 840 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
07/00/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/00/1922. Dep: 29/11/1922. | ||
03/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1926. Dep: 17/06/1926. | ||
21/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1927. Dep: 09/11/1927. | ||
11/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1929. Dep: 26/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
07/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1933. Dep: 10/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1206 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1936. Dep: 11/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1936. Dep: 18/05/1936. | ||
20/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1937. Dep: 02/03/1937. | ||
16/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1937. Dep: 17/12/1937. | ||
28/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1939. Dep: 02/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1941. Dep: 18/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49) |
||
17/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1942. Dep: 16/10/1942. | ||
17/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1942. Dep: 23/10/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
04/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49) |
||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
10/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1946. Dep: 27/09/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1400 |
||
25/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
14/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3937 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61400 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
24/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61469 | ||
14/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24075 (Diagram 49A) |
||
23/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955. | ||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 29/04/1955. | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
13/05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
08/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
20/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 04/06/1957. | ||
30/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24106 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1957. Dep: 04/09/1957. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
19/10/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61469 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |