|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/05/1923 | 13/08/1923 | 90 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1924 | 21/10/1924 | 58 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/09/1926 | 14/02/1927 | 145 days | General | Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1929 | 15/11/1929 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1930 | 07/10/1930 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1933 | 01/03/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1214 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1935 | 07/02/1936 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1938 | 24/05/1938 | 85 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1940 | 21/12/1940 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2707 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1943 | 26/11/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/02/1945 | 13/03/1945 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2884 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/12/1947 | 13/01/1948 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1950 | 24/06/1950 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24072 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1952 | 21/10/1952 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1954 | 17/07/1954 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24044 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/07/1954 | 21/07/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1957 | 24/05/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24030 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1958 | 29/12/1958 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1959 | 25/11/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 849 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
16/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1923. Dep: 13/08/1923. | ||
25/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1924. Dep: 21/10/1924. | ||
23/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1926. Dep: 14/02/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1929. Dep: 15/11/1929. | ||
25/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1930. Dep: 07/10/1930. | ||
23/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
22/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
24/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1933. Dep: 01/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1214 (Diagram 49) |
||
06/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1935. Dep: 07/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49) |
||
01/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1938. Dep: 24/05/1938. | ||
06/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2707 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
15/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1943. Dep: 26/11/1943. | ||
22/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1945. Dep: 13/03/1945. | ||
12/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1409 | ||
23/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2884 (Diagram 49) |
||
16/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1947. Dep: 13/01/1948. | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61409 but not taken up | ||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
15/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61478 | ||
31/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24072 (Diagram 49A) |
||
23/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1952. Dep: 21/10/1952. | ||
23/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1954. Dep: 17/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24044 (Diagram 49A) |
||
19/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/07/1954. Dep: 21/07/1954. | ||
01/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) | ||
29/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24030 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/11/1958. Dep: 29/12/1958. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
21/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959. | ||
16/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959. | ||
12/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
12/12/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61478 from York (North) (50A) |