|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/01/1924 | 14/03/1924 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1924 | 15/07/1924 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1925 | 30/10/1925 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/02/1926 | 08/03/1926 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1927 | 14/03/1928 | 104 days | General | Boiler number D1179 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1929 | 28/08/1929 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1930 | 19/12/1930 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D962 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/03/1932 | 16/03/1932 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1933 | 28/09/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1935 | 06/04/1935 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1935 | 26/04/1935 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1937 | 14/05/1937 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1937 | 27/05/1937 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1939 | 10/01/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1434 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1941 | 05/02/1941 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1942 | 12/10/1942 | 28 days | General | Boiler number D1510 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/10/1944 | 13/11/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1945 | 07/12/1945 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3579 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1947 | 02/01/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3578 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1950 | 22/12/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24011 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61417 |
||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2407] (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1955 | 26/04/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1957 | 20/06/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24044 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1959 | 23/10/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24053 (Diagram 49A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 921 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
03/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1924. Dep: 14/03/1924. | ||
20/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1924. Dep: 15/07/1924. | ||
28/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1925. Dep: 30/10/1925. | ||
18/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1926. Dep: 08/03/1926. | ||
02/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1927. Dep: 14/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1179 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
22/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
13/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1929. Dep: 28/08/1929. | ||
04/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1930. Dep: 19/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D962 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
08/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1932. Dep: 16/03/1932. | ||
23/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1933. Dep: 28/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49) |
||
16/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
09/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935. | ||
08/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1935. Dep: 26/04/1935. | ||
14/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1937. Dep: 27/05/1937. | ||
29/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1939. Dep: 10/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1434 (Diagram 49) |
||
25/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 05/02/1941. | ||
15/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1942. Dep: 12/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1510 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1944. Dep: 13/11/1944. | ||
16/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1945. Dep: 07/12/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3579 (Diagram 49A) |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1417 | ||
27/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1947. Dep: 02/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3578 (Diagram 49A) |
||
27/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1950. Dep: 22/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24011 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61417 |
||
19/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2407] (Diagram 49A) |
||
29/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A) |
||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 26/04/1955. | ||
20/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 20/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24044 (Diagram 49A) |
||
23/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24053 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61417 from York (North) (50A) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |