|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/08/1923 | 26/10/1923 | 62 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1924 | 15/08/1924 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/03/1927 | 01/08/1927 | 127 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1929 | 18/01/1930 | 60 days | General | Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1932 | 01/11/1932 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1935 | 13/05/1935 | 63 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1937 | 07/07/1937 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1628 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1937 | 24/12/1937 | 73 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1940 | 06/09/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1499 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1941 | 08/07/1941 | 49 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1942 | 20/05/1942 | 1 day | No repairs | In for bomb damage |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 925 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
26/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1923. Dep: 26/10/1923. | ||
18/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/07/1924. Dep: 15/08/1924. | ||
28/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1927. Dep: 01/08/1927. | ||
25/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
20/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1932. Dep: 01/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1935. Dep: 13/05/1935. | ||
24/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1937. Dep: 07/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1628 (Diagram 49) |
||
13/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/10/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937. | ||
01/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
25/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
26/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1940. Dep: 06/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1499 (Diagram 49) |
||
21/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1941. Dep: 08/07/1941. | ||
20/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/05/1942. Dep: 20/05/1942. Work undertaken: In for bomb damage |
||
13/06/1942 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 925 from York (North) (YK) |