|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/12/1923 | 06/03/1924 | 77 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1927 | 28/10/1927 | 207 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1931 | 23/02/1931 | 49 days | General | Boiler number D1229 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1934 | 29/10/1934 | 33 days | General | Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1936 | 13/11/1936 | 75 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1938 | 16/08/1938 | 56 days | General | Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1941 | 08/03/1941 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3167 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1943 | 21/10/1943 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1944 | 02/11/1944 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/05/1945 | 26/05/1945 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1946 | 30/08/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3500 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/10/1947 | 13/11/1947 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1949 | 21/09/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61424 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1949 | 12/10/1949 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1951 | 06/06/1951 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1952 | 27/06/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24065 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1954 | 06/05/1954 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1954 | 11/12/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1954 | 14/12/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1957 | 05/06/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1957 | 13/06/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 929 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
21/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1923. Dep: 06/03/1924. | ||
05/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1927. Dep: 28/10/1927. | ||
06/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1931. Dep: 23/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1229 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1934. Dep: 29/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49) |
||
31/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/08/1936. Dep: 13/11/1936. | ||
22/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1938. Dep: 16/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3167 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
31/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1943. Dep: 21/10/1943. | ||
10/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1944. Dep: 02/11/1944. | ||
07/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945. | ||
12/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1946. Dep: 30/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3500 (Diagram 49A) |
||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1424 | ||
21/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1947. Dep: 13/11/1947. | ||
26/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1949. Dep: 21/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61424 |
||
28/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/09/1949. Dep: 12/10/1949. | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
17/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1951. Dep: 06/06/1951. | ||
03/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1952. Dep: 27/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24065 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
20/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1954. Dep: 06/05/1954. | ||
18/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
10/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 14/12/1954. | ||
09/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1957. Dep: 05/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 13/06/1957. | ||
10/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
05/10/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61424 from York (North) (50A) |