|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 08/10/1925 | 23/12/1925 | 77 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/06/1927 | 16/09/1927 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1930 | 29/09/1930 | 85 days | General | Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/10/1931 | 12/11/1931 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1933 | 15/12/1933 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D1461 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1936 | 10/11/1936 | 49 days | General | Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1936 | 17/12/1936 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1938 | 03/01/1939 | 90 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1940 | 29/06/1940 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1942 | 24/12/1942 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2884 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/11/1944 | 24/11/1944 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1436 |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/12/1947 | 24/12/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1949 | 15/09/1949 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61436 |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1949 | 30/09/1949 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1951 | 31/05/1951 | 11 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1953 | 01/05/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24074 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/12/1955 | 23/12/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 23 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 24069 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1958 | 12/11/1958 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1922 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2365 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1174 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
08/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1925. Dep: 23/12/1925. | ||
28/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1927. Dep: 16/09/1927. | ||
07/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1930. Dep: 29/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1931. Dep: 12/11/1931. | ||
02/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1933. Dep: 15/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1461 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1936. Dep: 10/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49) |
||
25/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1936. Dep: 17/12/1936. | ||
30/09/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
06/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1938. Dep: 03/01/1939. | ||
02/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1942. Dep: 24/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2884 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
12/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1944. Dep: 24/11/1944. | ||
30/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1436 |
||
09/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1947. Dep: 24/12/1947. | ||
19/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1949. Dep: 15/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61436 |
||
24/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1949. Dep: 30/09/1949. | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
21/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/05/1951. Dep: 31/05/1951. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
17/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
09/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1953. Dep: 01/05/1953. | ||
10/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24074 (Diagram 49A) |
||
19/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955. | ||
20/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24069 (Diagram 49A) |
||
06/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1958. Dep: 12/11/1958. | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61436 | ||
03/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |