|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1924 | 03/1924 | Light Repair | Tall chimney fitted |
||||
Gateshead Works | 14/12/1925 | 17/03/1926 | 94 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/01/1929 | 04/04/1929 | 78 days | General | Standard buffers & hook. Vacuum elbow fitted Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1929 | 11/11/1929 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1931 | 14/12/1931 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1934 | 16/02/1934 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D1038 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1935 | 29/11/1935 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1938 | 22/04/1938 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1941 | 05/02/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1944 | 25/03/1944 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/07/1945 | 15/08/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1946 | 14/12/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3167 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/01/1948 | 30/01/1948 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/11/1948 | 26/11/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Cab damage Renumbered to BR 61442 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1950 | 22/04/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3495 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24078 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1953 | 22/04/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1956 | 31/05/1956 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 24001 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1956 | 22/06/1956 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1958 | 29/08/1958 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1960 | 29/01/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/03/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2371 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1180 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
14/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1925. Dep: 17/03/1926. | ||
17/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1929. Dep: 04/04/1929. Work undertaken: Standard buffers & hook. Vacuum elbow fitted Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1929. Dep: 11/11/1929. | ||
23/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
18/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1931. Dep: 14/12/1931. | ||
08/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1934. Dep: 16/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1038 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
18/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1935. Dep: 29/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) |
||
02/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1938. Dep: 22/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49) |
||
01/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1941. Dep: 05/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1945. Dep: 15/08/1945. | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1442 | ||
13/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3167 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1948. Dep: 30/01/1948. | ||
10/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1948. Dep: 26/11/1948. Work undertaken: Cab damage Renumbered to BR 61442 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
17/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3495 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24078 (Diagram 49) |
||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 22/04/1953. | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) | ||
01/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
13/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1956. Dep: 31/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24001 (Diagram 49A) |
||
08/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1956. Dep: 22/06/1956. | ||
22/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1958. Dep: 29/08/1958. | ||
29/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/01/1960. Dep: 29/01/1960. | ||
02/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
01/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61442 from Neville Hill (55H) |