|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 09/06/1926 | 10/01/1927 | 216 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/07/1927 | 07/07/1927 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/06/1929 | 23/08/1929 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1932 | 16/03/1932 | 52 days | General | Boiler number D1510 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1934 | 06/1934 | Light Repair | ||||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1934 | 22/01/1935 | 79 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1936 | 02/02/1937 | 64 days | Heavy | Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1937 | 22/10/1937 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1938 | 09/09/1938 | 32 days | General | Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1938 | 22/09/1938 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1939 | 07/02/1940 | 64 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1941 | 04/03/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1943 | 05/08/1943 | 85 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/03/1945 | 21/03/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1946 | 01/03/1947 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 2707 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/09/1948 | 05/10/1948 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61459 |
||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1950 | 18/11/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24006 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1950 | 21/11/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1956 | 15/11/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1958 | 31/07/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24083 (Diagram 49) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/10/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1376 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1212 Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
09/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1926. Dep: 10/01/1927. | ||
05/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1927. Dep: 07/07/1927. | ||
10/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1929. Dep: 23/08/1929. | ||
29/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
25/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1932. Dep: 16/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1510 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1934. Dep: ?/06/1934. | ||
05/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1934. Dep: 22/01/1935. | ||
01/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/12/1936. Dep: 02/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1937. Dep: 22/10/1937. | ||
09/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1938. Dep: 09/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49) |
||
10/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1938. Dep: 22/09/1938. | ||
06/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1939. Dep: 07/02/1940. | ||
25/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 04/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
13/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1943. Dep: 05/08/1943. | ||
05/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/03/1945. Dep: 21/03/1945. | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1459 | ||
28/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1946. Dep: 01/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2707 (Diagram 49) |
||
14/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/09/1948. Dep: 05/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61459 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
24/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1950. Dep: 18/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24006 (Diagram 49) |
||
20/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 21/11/1950. | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
23/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954. | ||
17/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1956. Dep: 15/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
16/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1958. Dep: 31/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24083 (Diagram 49) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61459 from York (North) (50A) | ||
02/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |