|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. | SLS/196108 |
26/08/1961 | York North MPD (50A) | At North shed 61448/64 were in steam ex-works, repainted and lined out. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/12/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1381 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1217 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
11/12/1929 | Modification | Diagram 49 number D1012 boiler fitted | ||
25/08/1932 | Modification | Diagram 49 number D1201 boiler fitted | ||
18/10/1934 | Modification | Diagram 49 number D1141 boiler fitted | ||
24/12/1936 | Modification | Diagram 49 number 2265 boiler fitted | ||
10/08/1939 | Modification | Diagram 49 number D1480 boiler fitted | ||
27/12/1941 | Modification | Diagram 49 number D1559 boiler fitted | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
04/04/1945 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 3491 boiler fitted | ||
22/11/1946 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 3495 boiler fitted | ||
11/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1464 | ||
11/02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61464 | ||
12/11/1949 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 3977 boiler fitted | ||
15/03/1952 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24053 boiler fitted | ||
20/05/1954 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24050 boiler fitted | ||
22/08/1956 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24081 boiler fitted | ||
08/01/1959 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24029 boiler fitted | ||
08/01/1959 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 3505 boiler fitted | ||
06/07/1961 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24108 boiler fitted | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
16/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61464 from Mirfield (56D) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |