Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17926 Week
» 70942 Month
» 190469 Year
» 3217322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2813 |
on |
22/10/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1613 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
61613 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1507 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Fri 22/10/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 18/12/1959 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
on |
31/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2813, name: WOODBASTWICK HALL Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1507 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1613 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61613 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
18/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61613 |
|
|