Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2815 |
on |
29/10/1930 |
British Railways |
61615 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley / E. Thompson |
Class |
B2 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1509 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Mon 29/10/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/02/1959 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
29/10/1930 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
4w/e |
17/11/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/02/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DON |
Doncaster |
on |
14/07/1947 |
WDN |
DON |
Doncaster |
on |
17/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
10/11/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/03/1946 |
Darlington Works |
2815 is being converted to B2. |
SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 |
Doncaster Works |
The first of the new A2's, 200, will probably be completed towards the end of May. It will be generally similar to 2001-6, but with no steam-collector on the dome.br/K2 class locomotives are again being overhauled at Doncaster. Of late all locos of this class have been shopped at Cowlairs. 2001/4 are also undergoing overhaul. |
SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 |
Stratford Works |
1671 has been back to Stratford with a cracked frame. Whilst in shops it will probably receive its new name. |
SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 |
Darlington Works |
2815 is being converted to B2. |
SLS/194605 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/10/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2815, name: CULFORD HALL Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1509 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61615 |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
02/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61615 |
|
|