Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4472 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23383 Week
» 88337 Month
» 291001 Year
» 3317854 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2817 |
m/e |
10/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1617 |
on |
09/02/1946 |
British Railways |
61617 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley / E. Thompson |
Class |
B2 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1511 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 10/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/08/1958 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1930 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/08/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2817, name: FORD CASTLE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1511 |
|
|
09/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1617 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61617 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61617 |
|
|