|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2843, name: CHAMPION LODGE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1614 |
||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1643 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) | ||
08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61643 | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
16/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
13/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
07/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
14/07/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61643 |