|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/10/1909 | 11/12/1909 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1918 | 07/12/1918 | 323 days | General | Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1922 | 29/04/1922 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1923 | 10/11/1923 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 196C |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1925 | 18/04/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5196 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1926 | 06/03/1926 | 5 days | Unclassified | Speed indicator and gear fitted for use by Bridge Stress Committee |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1927 | 09/04/1927 | 92 days | General | New superheated boiler piston valves and 21in cylinders fitted Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1928 | 02/02/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1933 | 19/08/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1935 | 02/02/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1936 | 26/12/1936 | 22 days | General | Heater connection fitted at front end Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1941 | 03/05/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 18 days | Heavy | Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1947 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 196 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4542 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
21/10/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1909. Dep: 11/12/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
19/01/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1918. Dep: 07/12/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
11/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1922. Dep: 29/04/1922. | ||
22/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 196C |
||
14/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5196 |
||
02/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1926. Dep: 06/03/1926. Work undertaken: Speed indicator and gear fitted for use by Bridge Stress Committee |
||
27/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
08/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927. Work undertaken: New superheated boiler piston valves and 21in cylinders fitted Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
31/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
23/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
15/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929. | ||
18/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
31/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
29/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1933. Dep: 19/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
12/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
05/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936. Work undertaken: Heater connection fitted at front end Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
04/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
03/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
26/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
05/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
18/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
01/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1471 but not taken up | ||
05/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
29/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1480 | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
26/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
31/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1480 from Annesley (ANN) | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947. | ||
03/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |