07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 284 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1044 |
|
|
1908 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/04/1908. |
|
|
1911 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/06/1911. |
|
|
1915 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/06/1915. |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/09/1917. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
05/01/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1922. Dep: 27/05/1922. |
|
|
20/02/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3284
|
|
|
11/05/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
03/11/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1924. Dep: 22/11/1924. |
|
|
23/11/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1925. Dep: 26/02/1926. |
|
|
15/10/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 07/01/1928. |
|
|
08/02/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930. |
|
|
09/01/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 27/02/1932. |
|
|
03/06/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933. |
|
|
17/11/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934. |
|
|
16/01/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. |
|
|
14/01/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. |
|
|
26/04/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1941. Dep: 21/06/1941. |
|
|
21/08/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. |
|
|
18/11/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2813 but not taken up |
|
|
12/01/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/01/1946. Dep: 12/01/1946. |
|
|
26/01/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3284 |
|
|