Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2237 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20040 Week
» 73056 Month
» 192583 Year
» 3219436 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
292 |
|
03/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3292 |
|
05/04/1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
239 |
Works Number |
1066 |
To Service |
During 03/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/01/1927 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1905 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/01/1927 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 292 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1066 |
|
|
1910 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/05/1910. |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/06/1912. |
|
|
07/03/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1921. Dep: 23/07/1921. |
|
|
21/09/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1923. Dep: 05/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3292
|
|
|
28/01/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1926. Dep: 24/04/1926. |
|
|
14/09/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/09/1926. Dep: 30/10/1926. |
|
|
05/01/1927 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3292 |
|
|