Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1411 |
|
03/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4411 |
|
29/04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2841 |
|
14/09/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
245 |
Works Number |
1109 |
To Service |
During 03/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 08/08/1947 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1947 |
Hitchin MPD |
A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Hitchin, 'Cl' 2801/41/59 and 'J3' 4138. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1411 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1109 |
|
|
1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/11/1913. |
|
|
10/07/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/07/1922. Dep: 02/09/1922. |
|
|
29/11/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1923. Dep: 29/04/1924. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4411
|
|
|
29/04/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
12/11/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1924. Dep: 09/12/1924. |
|
|
15/06/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925. |
|
|
12/07/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1926. Dep: 13/11/1926. |
|
|
19/01/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929. |
|
|
06/06/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931. |
|
|
10/08/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1931. Dep: 17/09/1931. |
|
|
27/05/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933. |
|
|
24/02/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. |
|
|
26/01/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935. |
|
|
14/11/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. |
|
|
20/02/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
13/05/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939. |
|
|
20/02/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. |
|
|
11/08/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. |
|
|
14/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2841 |
|
|
05/01/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
08/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2841 |
|
|