|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1913 | 12/1913 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1920 | 25/09/1920 | 80 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1923 | 08/09/1923 | 230 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1413N |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1925 | 15/08/1925 | 94 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4413 |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1927 | 04/10/1927 | 152 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1929 | 27/07/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1931 | 22/08/1931 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1933 | 13/05/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1935 | 23/02/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1935 | 01/02/1936 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1937 | 27/11/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1940 | 24/02/1940 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1944 | 08/04/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1413 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1111 |
||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/12/1913. | ||
08/07/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1920. Dep: 25/09/1920. | ||
22/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1923. Dep: 08/09/1923. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1413N |
||
14/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4413 |
||
06/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1927. Dep: 04/10/1927. | ||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929. | ||
27/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 22/08/1931. | ||
01/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933. | ||
17/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
08/09/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
19/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935. | ||
21/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 01/02/1936. | ||
30/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 27/11/1937. | ||
06/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940. | ||
16/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. | ||
18/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944. | ||
24/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. | ||
15/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2843 but not taken up | ||
04/01/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4413 |