Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18097 Week
» 71113 Month
» 190640 Year
» 3217493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1421 |
|
08/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4421 |
|
04/04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2851 |
|
29/09/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
248 |
Works Number |
1166 |
To Service |
During 08/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 05/08/1947 |
Service Life |
40 yrs , 5 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1907 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
on |
11/03/1927 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/08/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
DON |
Doncaster |
on |
05/08/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1947 |
Doncaster MPD |
A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Doncaster, 'Cl' 2832/50/51/66/86 and 'J3' 4113; they were all in a deplorable condition. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1421 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1166 |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/12/1914. Work undertaken: Superheater fitted
|
|
|
12/03/1920 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1920. Dep: 05/07/1920. Work undertaken: Converted to 2 cylinder simple from 4 cylinder compound
|
|
|
23/01/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1923. Dep: 01/05/1923. |
|
|
08/12/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1924. Dep: 04/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4421
|
|
|
26/11/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1926. Dep: 26/02/1927. |
|
|
11/03/1927 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
19/01/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 09/03/1929. |
|
|
14/12/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 25/01/1930. |
|
|
05/03/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932. |
|
|
05/05/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934. |
|
|
21/03/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Dep: 18/04/1936. |
|
|
05/02/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938. |
|
|
15/06/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. |
|
|
16/01/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943. |
|
|
25/09/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/09/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. |
|
|
14/04/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945. |
|
|
29/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2851 |
|
|
05/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2851 |
|
|