Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1178 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14584 Week
» 67600 Month
» 187127 Year
» 3213980 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1425 |
|
04/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4425 |
|
12/07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2855 |
|
10/11/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
249 |
Works Number |
1148 |
To Service |
During 04/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 01/01/1947 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
|
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/08/1947 |
Darlington Works |
The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1425 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1148 |
|
|
1911 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/03/1911. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/10/1916. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
10/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1922. Dep: 09/09/1922. |
|
|
03/02/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1923. Dep: 10/02/1923. |
|
|
15/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4425
|
|
|
14/01/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1926. Dep: 26/04/1926. |
|
|
19/08/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926. |
|
|
15/10/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928. |
|
|
19/10/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929. |
|
|
27/05/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933. |
|
|
18/05/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 22/06/1935. |
|
|
13/03/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937. |
|
|
11/02/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 01/04/1939. |
|
|
01/04/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
21/12/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 01/02/1941. |
|
|
23/01/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. |
|
|
11/04/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |
|
|
13/07/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
24/02/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. |
|
|
10/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2855 |
|
|
01/01/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2855 |
|
|