11/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1433 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1172 |
|
|
1910 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/10/1910. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/04/1916. |
|
|
21/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1922. Dep: 28/09/1922. |
|
|
29/06/1923 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
12/05/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1925. Dep: 25/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4433
|
|
|
31/08/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
22/10/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1926. Dep: 07/01/1927. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
07/01/1927 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
27/09/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1928. Dep: 15/11/1928. |
|
|
15/03/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930. |
|
|
13/02/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932. |
|
|
12/05/1932 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
31/03/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. |
|
|
31/12/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1935. Dep: 01/02/1936. |
|
|
24/04/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937. |
|
|
18/03/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. |
|
|
16/08/1942 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
10/04/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. |
|
|
23/05/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2863 but not taken up |
|
|
28/03/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/03/1946. Dep: 28/03/1946. |
|
|
02/05/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4433 |
|
|