Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 27 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17830 Week
» 70846 Month
» 190373 Year
» 3217226 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1450 |
|
07/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4450 |
|
01/11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2880 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
255 |
Works Number |
1199 |
To Service |
During 07/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/06/1946 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1908 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/06/1946 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1450 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1199 |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/03/1912. |
|
|
1920 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/01/1920. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
19/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1922. Dep: 22/07/1922. |
|
|
18/07/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4450
|
|
|
22/03/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1926. Dep: 07/08/1926. |
|
|
28/08/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1928. Dep: 26/10/1928. |
|
|
22/03/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 10/05/1930. |
|
|
11/04/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931. |
|
|
15/10/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. |
|
|
31/03/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. |
|
|
05/10/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935. |
|
|
17/04/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. |
|
|
18/11/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939. |
|
|
01/08/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942. |
|
|
03/06/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2880 but not taken up |
|
|
01/06/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. |
|
|
15/06/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4450 |
|
|