08/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1452 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1276 |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/03/1917. |
|
|
10/05/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1922. Dep: 08/07/1922. |
|
|
01/02/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/02/1923. Dep: 03/03/1923. |
|
|
11/07/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924. |
|
|
05/12/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4452
|
|
|
26/11/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1925. Dep: 19/12/1925. |
|
|
07/04/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1926. Dep: 27/08/1926. |
|
|
15/09/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1926. Dep: 14/10/1926. |
|
|
17/03/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 21/07/1928. |
|
|
01/02/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930. |
|
|
14/11/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. |
|
|
03/02/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 10/03/1934. |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 08/02/1936. |
|
|
25/09/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937. |
|
|
27/05/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939. |
|
|
30/03/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
14/02/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. |
|
|
27/02/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943. |
|
|
11/04/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |
|
|
25/03/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2882 but not taken up |
|
|
16/02/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 16/02/1946. |
|
|
27/02/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4452 |
|
|