Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1453 |
|
08/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4453 |
|
10/05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2883 |
|
07/07/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
263 |
Works Number |
1277 |
To Service |
During 08/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/07/1946 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1453 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1277 |
|
|
1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/02/1913. |
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/02/1919. |
|
|
21/04/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1921. Dep: 08/10/1921. |
|
|
18/01/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4453
|
|
|
12/10/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1925. Dep: 23/02/1926. |
|
|
19/11/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 10/02/1928. |
|
|
30/11/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1929. Dep: 04/01/1930. |
|
|
04/04/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931. |
|
|
08/04/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933. |
|
|
14/09/1933 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
06/11/1933 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
02/02/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. |
|
|
12/12/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937. |
|
|
07/01/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939. |
|
|
15/03/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941. |
|
|
27/02/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943. |
|
|
14/07/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
03/02/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. |
|
|
07/07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2883 |
|
|
13/07/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/07/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946. |
|
|
27/07/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2883 |
|
|