|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1920 | 05/03/1921 | 159 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1923 | 26/06/1923 | 111 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1925 | 18/07/1925 | 93 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4456 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1926 | 29/05/1926 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1927 | 14/05/1927 | 86 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1927 | 15/10/1927 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1929 | 11/05/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1930 | 31/05/1930 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1932 | 01/10/1932 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1934 | 03/11/1934 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1936 | 18/07/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1940 | 31/08/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1945 | 17/02/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
31/08/1947 | Doncaster MPD | A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Doncaster, 'Cl' 2832/50/51/66/86 and 'J3' 4113; they were all in a deplorable condition. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1456 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1280 |
||
28/09/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1920. Dep: 05/03/1921. | ||
08/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1923. Dep: 26/06/1923. | ||
17/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1925. Dep: 18/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4456 |
||
19/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1926. Dep: 29/05/1926. | ||
18/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1927. Dep: 14/05/1927. | ||
01/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927. | ||
23/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929. | ||
05/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930. | ||
27/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932. | ||
13/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 03/11/1934. | ||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. | ||
04/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. | ||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. | ||
14/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. | ||
09/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
10/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945. | ||
07/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. | ||
27/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2886 | ||
05/08/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2886 |