Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2063 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19866 Week
» 72882 Month
» 192409 Year
» 3219262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1015 |
m/e |
10/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4015 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7354 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
67354 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
205 |
Works Number |
788 |
To Service |
During 10/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 22/06/1953 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
09/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
MEL |
|
on |
01/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
MEL |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
on |
30/01/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/06/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1015 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 788 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4015 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7354 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67354 |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
30/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
06/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
22/06/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67354 |
|
|