Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18839 Week
» 71855 Month
» 191382 Year
» 3218235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1517 |
m/e |
10/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4517 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7372 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
67372 |
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
214 |
Works Number |
838 |
To Service |
During 10/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 18/05/1953 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1899 |
COP |
|
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
18/05/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
on |
23/02/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/05/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1923 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1517 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 838 |
|
|
11/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4517 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7372 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
30/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67372 |
|
|
05/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
18/05/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67372 |
|
|