Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 69 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17872 Week
» 70888 Month
» 190415 Year
» 3217268 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1520 |
m/e |
11/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4520 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7375 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67375 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
214 |
Works Number |
841 |
To Service |
During 11/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 05/04/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/04/1955 |
ALLOC |
NEMPA |
|
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1921 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1520 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 841 |
|
|
05/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4520 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7375 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67375 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
04/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
05/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67375 |
|
|