Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2052 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19855 Week
» 72871 Month
» 192398 Year
» 3219251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1531 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4531 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7384 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
67384 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
234 |
Works Number |
1017 |
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 07/05/1956 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1903 |
LNG |
|
Langwith Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
LTH |
|
Louth |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/05/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LTH |
Louth |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1923 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61508/24, 62240/60/65, 64466/71, 64500, 4531, 5229, 65279, 68192, ex-L.M.S. 44254, 4324, 15136, 17251, 17359, 17450/51. |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1531 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1017 |
|
|
04/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4531 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7384 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Langwith Junction (LNG) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67384 |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (LTH) |
|
|
05/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67384 |
|
|