Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3000 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16406 Week
» 69422 Month
» 188949 Year
» 3215802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1534 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4534 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7385 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
67385 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
234 |
Works Number |
1020 |
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 01/04/1955 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/04/1955 |
ALLOC |
NEMPA |
|
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1922 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1534 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1020 |
|
|
07/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4534 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7385 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67385 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
04/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67385 |
|
|