Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 163 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19074 Week
» 84028 Month
» 286692 Year
» 3313545 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
27 |
m/e |
10/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5027 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7424 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
67424 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C13 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 14/11/1958 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1904 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
39B |
|
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/11/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1930 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/10/1948 |
Darlington Works |
The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 27 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5027 |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7424 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67424 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
14/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67424 |
|
|
02/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|