Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2446 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 18058 Week
» 116703 Month
» 319367 Year
» 3346220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1129 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6129 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7449 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67449 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C14 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4935 |
To Service |
During 06/1907 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/12/1957 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1907 |
ARD |
|
Ardsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
WRX |
|
Wrexham Rhosddu |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/12/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
WRX |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1930 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1129 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4935 |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6129 |
|
|
06/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7449 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
17/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (WRX) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67449 |
|
|
07/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67449 |
|
|
07/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|