Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1848 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19651 Week
» 72667 Month
» 192194 Year
» 3219047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1370 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4370 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2173 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62173 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
221 |
Works Number |
907 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1950 off Colwick (38A) |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1900 |
GRA |
|
Grantham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
05/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GRA |
Grantham |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
WDN |
38A |
Colwick |
on |
29/05/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/08/1947 |
Doncaster Works |
On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. |
SLS/194710 |
17/07/1949 |
Derby Friargate MPD |
On 17/7 the following were noted at the ex G.N.R*. shed here, during the evening:-'D.2' Nos. 62172, 2173/77; 'D.3' No. 2123; 'J.5' Nos. 65484/85, 5497; 'J.6' No.4215; 'J.69' No. 8527. On this date, owing to extensive P.W. repairs on the ex L.M.S. line between Repton and Pear Tree Junction, involving a long section of single line working, certain ex L.M.S. trains from Burton to Derby were diverted via Dove Junction and Egginton over the ex G.N. line to Derby (with ex L.N.E.R. pilotmen from Egginton), passengers being conveyed from Derby (Friargate) to the ex L.M.S. station by omnibus. *The ex G.N. shed at Derby, the entrance to which is in Slack Lane (off Uttoxeter Old Road), is well worth a visit by members visiting the ex L.M.S. Works and Shed at Derby. |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1370 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 907 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4370 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2173 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62173 but not taken up |
|
|
05/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2173 from Colwick (38A) |
|
|