Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18156 Week
» 71172 Month
» 190699 Year
» 3217552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1018 |
m/e |
02/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6018 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2305 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62305 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
D9 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
E1182b |
Works Number |
4828 |
To Service |
During 02/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 24/07/1950 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
m/e |
28/02/1946 |
ALLOC |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
on |
10/08/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/07/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1919 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
08/1919 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1950 |
Great Central classes |
Some of the Great Central classes are now becoming extinct: class 'B.5' No. 1686 withdrawn on 12/6 was the last to remain in traffic; built in 1904 (Beyer Peacock No. 4534) it belonged to G.C. 'Class 8' which were termed the 'Fish Engines,' with outside cylinders 19' x 26' and 6' 1' coupled wheels: originally No. 183, it was subsequently allotted L.N.E. Nos. 5183, 1308. and 1686 and B.R. 61686-but none of the class were renumbered in the 6XXXX. Another class which has become extinct is 'B.7,' once known as the 'Baby Faringdons' (G.C. class '9Q') with four cylinders 16' x 26' and 5' 8' coupled wheels: No. 61711, withdrawn 3/7/50, was built at Gorton in October 1923 as L.N.E. No. 478C (later 5478), renumbered 1391 on 25/11/46. 61391 on 29/1/49 and 61711 on 30/4/49. The withdrawal of 62307 Queen Mary on 12/6/50 left only one of the 'D.9' class in service (No. 62305, originally G.C. No. 1018, built in 1902). Later. No. 62305 was withdrawn 24/7/50. |
SLS/195008 |
24/07/1950 |
Last D.6 |
It will be seen that the last of the D.6, on loan to the L.M.R. has been condemned (62305, 24/7). |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1018 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4828 |
|
|
08/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
08/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6018 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2305 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62305 |
|
|
24/07/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62305 |
|
|
10/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|