Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1151 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18954 Week
» 71970 Month
» 191497 Year
» 3218350 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
508 |
m/e |
03/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5508 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2662 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62662 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
Large/Scottish Director |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/08/1960 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1949 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/08/1958 |
DarnallMPD |
Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. |
SLS/195809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 508, name: PRINCE OF WALES Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5508 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2662 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62662 |
|
|
22/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62662 |
|
|