|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
11/03/1961 | Polmont MPD (in store) | On 11th Mch. the following were in store-62682/9/90/1/3, 64482/515/8/32/5, 68448/54/71/2, 69014. | SLS/196104 |
13/05/1961 | Bo\'ness MPD | In store beyond the station beside the now closed dock-54475/83, 55222, 56169, 56370, 57245/57/64/85/7, 57338/66/73, 57411/26/9/70, 57557/76, 62689, 64471/82, 64515/35, 68325/454. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6396, name: MAID OF LORN Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 611 |
||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2689 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) | ||
07/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62689 | ||
13/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
02/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
13/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62689 | ||
08/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |