|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1950 | Stratford Works | One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. | SLS/195005 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1900 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1898 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
||
06/1915 | Modification | Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted | ||
06/1915 | Modification | Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted | ||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8898 | ||
05/1924 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
04/1933 | Modification | Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted | ||
06/1936 | Modification | Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7768 but not taken up | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2509 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62509 | ||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | |||
16/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
22/09/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62509 from Norwich Thorpe (32A) |