Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3462 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16868 Week
» 69884 Month
» 189411 Year
» 3216264 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1846 |
m/e |
12/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8846 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7716 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2557 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
62557 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G61 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 31/10/1955 off Cambridge (31A) |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
31/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1924 |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
02/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1934 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
04/1944 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
04/1944 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1944 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1846 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8846 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Modification |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7716 but not taken up |
|
|
04/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
04/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2557 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62557 |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
31/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62557 from Cambridge (31A) |
|
|