Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18839 Week
» 71855 Month
» 191382 Year
» 3218235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1839 |
m/e |
07/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8839 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7709 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2570 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62570 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A64 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 24/11/1959 off March (31B) |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1922 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
by 1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
04/1928 |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
09/1949 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
09/1949 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1949 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1839 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1922 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8839 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7709 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2570 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
09/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62570 |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62570 from March (31B) |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|