|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1820 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8820 | ||
03/1930 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
05/1932 | Modification | Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted | ||
05/1932 | Modification | Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted | ||
05/1936 | Modification | Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted | ||
05/1939 | Modification | Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted | ||
05/1939 | Modification | Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7690 but not taken up | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2571 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) | ||
06/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62571 | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/01/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62571 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
02/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |