|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Cut Up) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1821 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
||
05/1920 | Modification | Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted | ||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8821 | ||
02/1924 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
05/1933 | Modification | Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted | ||
05/1933 | Modification | Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7691 but not taken up | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2572 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL) | ||
28/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62572 | ||
31/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
23/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
21/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
28/07/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62572 from March (31B) | ||
12/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |